Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 05/21/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/01/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/01/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/01/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/01/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/01/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/01/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/01/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/01/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/01/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/01/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/01/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/01/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/10/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/10/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/10/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/10/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/10/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/10/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/10/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/10/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/10/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/10/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/10/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/10/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/10/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/10/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/10/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/10/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/24/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/24/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/24/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/24/1992
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/24/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/24/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/24/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/24/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/24/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/24/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/24/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/24/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/24/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/24/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/24/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/17/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/17/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/17/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/17/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/17/1992