Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/16/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/16/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/16/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/16/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/16/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/16/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/16/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/16/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/16/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/16/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/16/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/25/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/25/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 06/25/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/25/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/25/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 06/25/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/25/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/25/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/25/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/21/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/21/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/21/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 07/21/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/21/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/21/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/11/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 08/11/1992
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/11/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 08/11/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 08/11/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/11/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/11/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/11/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/11/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 08/11/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/09/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/09/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/09/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/03/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/03/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/03/1992