There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Medicinal Drug Use Clarification Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Entitled the "Animal Medicinal Drug Use Clarification Act of 1992".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/28/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/15/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/28/1992Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (158)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/25/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/25/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/25/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/25/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/25/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/25/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/25/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/02/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/02/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/02/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/22/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/22/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/22/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/22/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/22/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/12/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/12/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/12/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 08/12/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 08/12/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 08/12/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/18/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/18/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/18/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/18/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/18/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/18/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/18/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/02/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/02/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/02/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 10/02/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 10/02/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/02/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/02/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/02/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/05/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/05/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/28/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/15/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5297.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/28/1992)

Animal Medicinal Drug Use Clarification Act of 1992 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to allow, on order of a veterinarian: (1) a new animal drug approved for one use to be used for a different purpose, provided the use does not result in residues in food in violation of established safe levels for the drug; and (2) a new drug approved for human use to be used in non-food producing animals.