Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/25/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/25/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/25/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/25/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/25/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/25/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/25/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/02/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/02/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/02/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/22/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/22/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/22/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/22/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/22/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/12/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/12/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/12/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 08/12/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 08/12/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 08/12/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/18/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/18/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/18/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/18/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/18/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/18/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/18/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/02/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/02/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/02/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 10/02/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 10/02/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/02/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/02/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/02/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/05/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/05/1992