There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the transfer of excess Department of Defense construction and fire equipment to foreign governments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/28/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/18/1992Executive Comment Requested from State, DOD.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/10/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/28/1992Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/28/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 05/28/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/09/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/09/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/09/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/09/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/09/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/09/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/09/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/09/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/09/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/09/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/09/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/09/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/09/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/17/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/28/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science06/10/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5299.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5299. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/28/1992)

Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to exclude construction and fire equipment from the definition of "excess defense articles" for purposes of restricting the transfer of such equipment to foreign countries.