There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to remove the limitations on the number of units of the Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps that may be established and maintained at secondary educational institutions that apply for such units.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/02/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/05/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/05/1992Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
06/02/1992Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/02/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/11/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/11/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/11/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/11/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/17/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/17/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/17/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/17/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/24/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/24/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/24/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 06/24/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 06/24/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/01/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/01/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/01/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/01/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/01/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/01/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/02/1992
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/30/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/30/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 07/30/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/30/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/30/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/30/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/10/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/10/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/10/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/10/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/22/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/22/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/02/1992 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation06/05/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5307.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/02/1992)

Removes the annual and total limits on the number of Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps (JROTC) units that may be maintained at public and private secondary educational institutions. Includes, as a condition to establishing a JROTC unit at such institution, that the institution agrees to such establishment and maintenance for no less than five academic years.