Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/23/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/09/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/22/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/29/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/03/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/10/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/10/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/12/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/17/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/17/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/17/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/22/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/30/1992