Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/04/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 06/04/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/04/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 06/04/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 06/04/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/05/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/05/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/05/1992
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 06/10/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/10/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/23/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 06/23/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/01/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/01/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/01/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 07/01/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/10/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 09/10/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/03/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/03/1992