Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/10/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/16/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 06/16/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/16/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/16/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/16/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/16/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/16/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/16/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/16/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/16/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/16/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/16/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/16/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/16/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/17/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/17/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/17/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/18/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/18/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/18/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/18/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/18/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/23/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/23/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/23/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/25/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/25/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/25/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/02/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/21/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 07/21/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/03/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/03/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/05/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 08/10/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/16/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/16/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/1992