Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/02/1992)

Cash Management Improvement Act Amendments of 1992 - Amends the Cash Management Improvement Act of 1990 (the Act) to require the Secretary of the Treasury to prescribe regulations for the timely disbursement of Federal funds with respect to each State by July 1, 1993.

Extends the deadline for the Secretary to enter into agreements with States for intergovernmental financing and to prescribe regulations for such financing from October 24, 1992, until July 1, 1993, or by the first day of a fiscal year of the State which begins in 1993, whichever is later. Makes the Act effective on such date.

Extends for one year the report to the Congress by the Comptroller General on the implementation of such Act.

Makes businesses eligible for the Internal Revenue Service tax refund offset program.

Extends the private counsel pilot debt collection program through September 30, 1996, and includes five more jurisdictions. Authorizes the Attorney General to extend or modify any or all of the contracts entered into with private counsel prior to October 1, 1992, for such time as necessary to conduct a full and open competition.

Requires the Inspector General of the Department of Justice to audit such program for the period beginning on Octboer 1, 1991, and ending on September 30, 1994. Requires the Inspector General to determine: (1) the extent of the competition among private counsel to obtain contracts; (2) the reasonableness of the fees under such contracts; (3) the diligence and efforts of the Attorney General to retain private counsel; (4) the results of the debt collection efforts of private counsel retained; and (5) the cost-effectiveness of the project compared with the use of the U.S. Attorneys' Offices for debt collection. Requires a report to the Congress not later than June 30, 1995.

Requires the Attorney General, in order to assist the Congress in determining whether use of private counsel is a cost-effective method of collecting Government debts, to maintain and make available to the Inspector General of the Department of Justice statistical data relating to the comparative costs of debt collection by participating U.S. Attorneys' Offices and by private counsel.