There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Granting the consent of the Congress to a supplemental compact or agreement between the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the State of New Jersey concerning the Delaware River Port Authority.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/27/1992Pocket Vetoed by President.
10/15/1992Presented to President.
10/07/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/02/1992Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
09/22/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/1992Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-875.
06/22/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
10/27/1992Pocket Vetoed by President.
10/15/1992HousePresented to President.
10/09/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/02/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 783.
10/02/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
10/02/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/24/1992SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
09/22/1992-9:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/1992-9:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/22/1992-9:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/22/1992-9:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
09/22/1992-9:06pmHouseMr. Frank (MA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/17/1992HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 203.
09/17/1992HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-875.
08/11/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/11/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported.
08/06/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/24/1992HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
06/24/1992HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
06/24/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/1992HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
06/22/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
06/22/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/22/1992 Referred to
08/11/1992 Markup by
09/17/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-875
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations06/24/1992 Referred to
06/24/1992 Hearings by
06/24/1992 Markup by
06/24/1992 Reported by
Senate Judiciary09/24/1992 Referred to
10/02/1992 Markup by
10/02/1992 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/1992)

Grants the consent of the Congress to an amendment to the Delaware River Joint Commission compact between the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the State of New Jersey continuing such commission under the name of the Delaware River Port Authority.