Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/24/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/02/1992
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/02/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/02/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/02/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/02/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 07/02/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/02/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/02/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/02/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 07/02/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 07/02/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/02/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/02/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 07/02/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/02/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/02/1992
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 07/02/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/02/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/02/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/21/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/21/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/21/1992
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/21/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/21/1992
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 07/21/1992
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/21/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/21/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/21/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/21/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/21/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/21/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/21/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/21/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/21/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/21/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/29/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/29/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/29/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/29/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/29/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/29/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/29/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/29/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/29/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/29/1992
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/29/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/29/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/29/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/29/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/29/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/10/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/10/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/10/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/10/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/23/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/23/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/23/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/23/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/23/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/23/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/23/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/01/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/01/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/01/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/01/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/01/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1992