Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 06/24/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Colordao, Antonio [D-PR-At Large]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 06/24/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/02/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/02/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/02/1992
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/02/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/02/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 07/02/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/09/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/09/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/09/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/09/1992
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/09/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/09/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/03/1992
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 08/03/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/03/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/03/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/03/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 08/03/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 08/03/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 08/03/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/03/1992
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/04/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 08/04/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 08/04/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/04/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 08/04/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/04/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/12/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/18/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/18/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/05/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/05/1992