There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Marlin, Texas, as the "Thomas T. Connally Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/23/1992Became Public Law No: 102-449.
10/23/1992Signed by President.
10/15/1992Presented to President.
10/08/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/04/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/24/1992Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-715.
06/25/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/23/1992Became Public Law No: 102-449.
10/23/1992Signed by President.
10/15/1992HousePresented to President.
10/09/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateSenate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/1992SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
08/04/1992-6:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-6:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
08/04/1992-6:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate.
08/04/1992-6:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/04/1992-6:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
08/04/1992-6:07pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/24/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 404.
07/24/1992HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-715.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/23/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/23/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/25/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/25/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/22/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/22/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/22/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/22/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/22/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/22/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/22/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/22/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/22/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/22/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/22/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/22/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/22/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/22/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/22/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/22/1992
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 07/22/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/22/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/22/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/22/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/22/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/24/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/24/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/24/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/24/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/24/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/24/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/24/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/25/1992 Referred to
07/23/1992 Markup by
07/24/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-715
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/05/1992 Referred to
10/08/1992 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5491.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5491. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/1992)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Marlin, Texas, as the Thomas T. Connally Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center.