Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Colordao, Antonio [D-PR-At Large]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 07/01/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/01/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/03/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/03/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/03/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/03/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/03/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/03/1992
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 08/03/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 08/03/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/03/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/03/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 08/03/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/03/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/03/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 08/03/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 08/03/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/03/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 08/03/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/03/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/03/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/03/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/04/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/04/1992
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 08/10/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/10/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/10/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/12/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 10/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/05/1992