Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/02/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 07/02/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 07/02/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/16/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/16/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/16/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/16/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/16/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/16/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/16/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/16/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/16/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/16/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/16/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/16/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/16/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/16/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/16/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/18/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/23/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/23/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/23/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/24/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/24/1992