There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Rural Electrification Act of 1936, require the sale of all loans made under such Act, and authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to make loans to electric generation and transmission cooperatives which are unable to obtain needed financing in the private sector.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/02/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/09/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/02/1992Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/02/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/24/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/24/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/10/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/02/1992 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development07/09/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5549.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5549. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/02/1992)

Repeals the Rural Electrification Act of 1936.

Requires the cash sale to private investors of outstanding loans made under such Act.

Amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to authorize loans to electric power cooperative associations unable to secure credit at reasonable rates elsewhere.