Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 01/18/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 01/18/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 01/29/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/29/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/29/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 01/29/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/29/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/29/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/29/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/29/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/29/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/29/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/06/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/12/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/12/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/12/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/12/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 03/12/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/25/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/25/1991