Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 07/09/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/09/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/23/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/23/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 07/23/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/23/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/23/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/23/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/23/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/23/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/23/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/23/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/23/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/23/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/23/1992
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/30/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/30/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/30/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/30/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/30/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 07/30/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/30/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 08/04/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/04/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/04/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 08/05/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/05/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/05/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/05/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/05/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/05/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/05/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/05/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/05/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 08/05/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/05/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/05/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 08/05/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 08/05/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/05/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 08/05/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 08/05/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/12/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 08/12/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/15/1992