Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 07/09/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/22/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/29/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/29/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/29/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/06/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/06/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 08/06/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/12/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 09/14/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/30/1992