Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 07/22/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 07/22/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 09/10/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/22/1992