Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/31/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 07/31/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/04/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/04/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 08/04/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/10/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 08/10/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 08/12/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/12/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/09/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/09/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/09/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/09/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/09/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 09/09/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/09/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/09/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/15/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/15/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/15/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 09/21/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/21/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/21/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/21/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/22/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/22/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/23/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/30/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/05/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/08/1992