Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/10/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/17/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/17/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/17/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/17/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/23/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/24/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/24/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/24/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/24/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/24/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/01/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/01/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/01/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 10/01/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/01/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/01/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/01/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/01/1992
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 10/01/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/01/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/01/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 10/01/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/01/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/01/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/01/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/01/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/01/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 10/01/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/01/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/01/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/01/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/05/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/05/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 10/05/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/05/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 10/05/1992
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/05/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/05/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/05/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/05/1992