Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 09/18/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/18/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 09/18/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/24/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/24/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/24/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/24/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/24/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/24/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 09/24/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 10/02/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/02/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 10/02/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/02/1992
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/02/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/02/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 10/02/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/02/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/02/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/03/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 10/05/1992