There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the United States Warehouse Act to provide for the use of electronic cotton warehouse receipts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/28/1992Became Public Law No: 102-553.
10/28/1992Signed by President.
10/19/1992Presented to President.
10/07/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/04/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/04/1992Committee on Agriculture discharged.
10/03/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/28/1992Became Public Law No: 102-553.
10/28/1992Signed by President.
10/19/1992HousePresented to President.
10/09/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/05/1992SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/04/1992-7:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/04/1992-7:51pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/04/1992-7:51pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
10/04/1992-7:51pmHouseMr. de la Garza asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/04/1992HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
10/04/1992HouseSubcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar Discharged.
10/03/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/03/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
10/03/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 10/03/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture10/03/1992 Referred to
10/04/1992 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar10/03/1992 Referred to
10/04/1992 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6128. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/03/1992)

Amends the United States Warehouse Act to permit all (Federal or State licensed) cotton warehouses to record specified cotton receipt information required by such Act in a central filing system or systems.

Deems such recording as establishing ownership under Federal or State law.

States that: (1) a holder of an electronic cotton warehouse receipt shall be treated as being in possession of the warehouse receipt under Federal or State law; and (2) such provision shall apply to electronic receipts form all (Federal or State licensed) warehouses.

Amends the Agricultural Adjustment Act, reenacted with amendments by the Agricultural Marketing Agreement Act of 1937, to provide for expedited action on marketing orders.