Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/29/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 02/28/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/02/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 11/07/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/07/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/07/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 11/07/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/18/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/11/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/02/1992