Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/30/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/21/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/07/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/07/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/21/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/21/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/21/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/21/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/24/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/02/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/02/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/19/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/19/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/29/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/29/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/23/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/23/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/23/1992