There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Drug Rehabilitation and Recovery Program for Prisons Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish permanent Federal and State drug treatment programs for criminal offenders, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
11/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/30/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 01/30/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/30/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 01/30/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 02/19/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/19/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/19/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/19/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/19/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/19/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/19/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/19/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/19/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/19/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/19/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/19/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/07/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/22/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/22/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/15/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/09/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/09/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/21/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/21/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/21/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/21/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/10/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/04/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/30/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/11/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary01/30/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice11/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.730.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.730. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/1991)

Drug Rehabilitation and Recovery Program for Prisons Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to create a new part, to be cited as the Drug Rehabilitation and Recovery Program for Prisons Act, directing the Attorney General, in consultation with the Secretary of Health and Human Services and the Director of the Office of National Drug Control Policy, to establish a comprehensive drug treatment program in Federal prisons. Authorizes appropriations.

Directs the Secretary to award grants to States to establish drug treatment programs in State prisons and for juvenile criminal offenders.

Requires a State, as a part of its application for such a grant, to submit plans for establishing such programs. Authorizes the Secretary to award grants to enable plan preparation.

Allows the Director to award a grant under these provisions to a State without an application and plan if the State has begun implementing a plan for demonstration prison or juvenile criminal offenders drug treatment programs under specified provisions of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968.

Authorizes appropriations.

Prohibits the Attorney General and the appropriate State law enforcement official from permitting the early release of inmates convicted of drug offenses unless the inmates have successfully completed a program of treatment or after care under this Act. Sets forth early release requirements.