Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 02/21/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 03/13/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/13/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/13/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/13/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/13/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/13/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/13/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/13/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/22/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/22/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/11/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/11/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/23/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/23/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/23/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/05/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/05/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/20/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/20/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/20/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/20/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/26/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/17/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/17/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/17/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/17/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/24/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/24/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/24/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/25/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/31/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/31/1991
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/31/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/31/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/31/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/31/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 08/02/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/11/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 09/11/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 09/11/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/16/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 09/16/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/25/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/25/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/25/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 10/09/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/18/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 01/30/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 02/27/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/07/1992