Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/21/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/21/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/21/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/21/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/21/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/21/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/21/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/21/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/21/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/21/1991
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/21/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/21/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/21/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/21/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/21/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/21/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/21/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/21/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/21/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/21/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/25/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 02/27/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/07/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/07/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 04/17/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 04/17/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/17/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/17/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/04/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/11/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/11/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/14/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/02/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/20/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 05/20/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/09/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 08/06/1992