Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 01/31/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/31/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/05/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/05/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/05/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 02/05/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/05/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 02/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/05/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/05/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/05/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/05/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/05/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/05/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/05/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 02/05/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/05/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/05/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/05/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/05/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 02/20/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/20/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/20/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/20/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/20/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/20/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/20/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/20/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/20/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 02/20/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/20/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/20/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/20/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/20/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/20/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/20/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/20/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 02/20/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/05/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 03/05/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/05/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/05/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/05/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 03/05/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 03/05/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/05/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 03/05/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 03/05/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 03/05/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/05/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/05/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/05/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/05/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/05/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 03/05/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/05/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/07/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/07/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/07/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/07/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/07/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 03/07/1991