Committees: H.R.776 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/04/1991 Referred to
03/11/1992 Markup by
03/30/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/25/1991 Referred to
05/29/1991 Hearings by
10/31/1991 Markup by
10/31/1991 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs03/30/1992 Referred to
04/29/1992 Markup by
05/04/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 4
House Government Operations03/30/1992 Referred to
04/30/1992 Markup by
05/05/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 5
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Environment, Energy, and Natural Resources04/16/1992 Referred to
04/28/1992 Hearings by
04/30/1992 Markup by
04/30/1992 Reported by
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation04/16/1992 Referred to
04/28/1992 Hearings by
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice, and Agriculture04/16/1992 Referred to
04/28/1992 Hearings by
04/30/1992 Markup by
04/30/1992 Reported by
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security04/16/1992 Referred to
House Judiciary03/30/1992 Referred to
04/30/1992 Markup by
05/05/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 7
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/30/1992 Referred to
04/09/1992 Markup by
05/05/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 8
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries03/30/1992 Referred to
04/30/1992 Markup by
05/05/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 9
House Public Works and Transportation03/30/1992 Referred to
04/30/1992 Markup by
05/01/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 3
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds04/06/1992 Referred to
04/08/1992 Hearings by
04/28/1992 Markup by
04/28/1992 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation04/06/1992 Referred to
04/09/1992 Hearings by
04/29/1992 Markup by
04/29/1992 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources04/06/1992 Referred to
04/09/1992 Hearings by
04/29/1992 Markup by
04/29/1992 Reported by
House Science, Space and Technology03/30/1992 Referred to
04/02/1992 Markup by
05/01/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 2
House Ways and Means03/30/1992 Referred to
04/28/1992 Hearings by
04/30/1992 Markup by
05/05/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-474 Part 6
House Agriculture04/28/1992 Referred to
05/05/1992 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy04/29/1992 Referred to
04/29/1992 Hearings by
Senate Finance06/04/1992 Referred to
06/16/1992 Markup by
06/18/1992 Reported by