Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 02/05/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/05/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 04/09/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/09/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/09/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/09/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/09/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/09/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/09/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/09/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/09/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/09/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/09/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/09/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/09/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/09/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/09/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/09/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/03/1992