Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/21/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/21/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/21/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/21/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/21/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/21/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 02/21/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/21/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/21/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/21/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/21/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/21/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/21/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/21/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/21/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/21/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/21/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/21/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/27/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/27/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 02/27/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/27/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 02/27/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/27/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/27/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/27/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 02/27/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/27/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 02/27/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/27/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 02/27/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 02/27/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 02/27/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/27/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/27/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/27/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 02/27/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/27/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/07/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/07/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/07/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/07/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/07/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/07/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/07/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/07/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/13/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/13/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/13/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/13/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/13/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/13/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/21/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/21/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 04/10/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/10/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/10/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/10/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/10/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/10/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/10/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/10/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/10/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/16/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/02/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/02/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/16/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/16/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/16/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/19/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/12/1992