Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/06/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/06/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/06/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/28/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/28/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/28/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/16/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/16/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/16/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/17/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/17/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/22/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/05/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/02/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/12/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/12/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/12/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/12/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/24/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 11/06/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/06/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 11/13/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/13/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/19/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/24/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/29/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/04/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/1992