Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/28/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/28/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 02/28/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/28/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/28/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 02/28/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/28/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 02/28/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/28/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/28/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/28/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/28/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/28/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/28/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/28/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/28/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 02/28/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 02/28/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/28/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/28/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 02/28/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/28/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/28/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/04/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/04/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/04/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 03/04/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 03/04/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/04/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/04/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/05/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/05/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/05/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/05/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/05/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/07/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 03/07/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/07/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/07/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/07/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/12/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/12/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/18/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/18/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 03/18/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/18/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/18/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/18/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/22/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/22/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/09/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/09/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/17/1991