Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/22/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 03/22/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 03/22/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/22/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/22/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/22/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 03/22/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/22/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/22/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/22/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 03/22/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/22/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/22/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/22/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/22/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/22/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 03/22/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/22/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/22/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/16/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/16/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/16/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/25/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/25/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/08/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/03/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 06/03/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 06/03/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/03/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/03/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/03/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/03/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/03/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/03/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/03/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/03/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/06/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/06/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/06/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/06/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/06/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/06/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/06/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/06/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/06/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/06/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/06/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/20/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/20/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/20/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/20/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 06/20/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/20/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/20/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 06/20/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/20/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 06/20/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/11/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/11/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/11/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/11/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 07/11/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/11/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/11/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/30/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/30/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/30/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/30/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/12/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/12/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/12/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/12/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/12/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/12/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/12/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/12/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/24/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/24/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 10/03/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/03/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/17/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/17/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/17/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/17/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/31/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/31/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 10/31/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/31/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/13/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 11/13/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/13/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 11/22/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/04/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 02/04/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/19/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/19/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/19/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/05/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/05/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/05/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/05/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 03/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/05/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 03/05/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 03/11/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/20/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/20/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 03/20/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/20/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/24/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/24/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/24/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 03/24/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/24/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/24/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/26/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 03/26/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/26/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/01/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/01/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 04/07/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/07/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/07/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/29/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/06/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 05/06/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/07/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/12/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/12/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/19/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/19/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/19/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/02/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/02/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/02/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/10/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/11/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/11/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/18/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/12/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/12/1992