Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/20/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 02/20/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/20/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/20/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/05/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/05/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/29/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 11/20/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/1991