Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/07/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/08/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/21/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/21/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/29/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/29/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/04/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/16/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/23/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 07/30/1991