There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for the printing of a revised edition of the booklet entitled "Our American Government" as a House Document.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
10/04/1991 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/03/1991 Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. Without written report.
08/01/1991 Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1991 Committee on House Administration discharged.
06/20/1991 Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/07/1991 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
10/04/1991 Senate Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/03/1991 Senate Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Rules and Administration
10/03/1991 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252.
10/03/1991 Senate Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Rules and Administration
08/02/1991 Senate Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules.
08/01/1991-12:29pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1991-12:29pm House On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1991-12:29pm House Considered by unanimous consent.
08/01/1991-12:29pm House Mr. Annunzio asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
08/01/1991 House Committee on House Administration discharged.
07/25/1991 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
07/25/1991 House Ordered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
07/18/1991 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing
07/18/1991 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing
06/25/1991 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
06/20/1991 House Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
06/20/1991 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/17/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/17/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/17/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/20/1991 Referred to
07/25/1991 Markup by
08/01/1991 Discharged from
House Administration Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing06/25/1991 Referred to
07/18/1991 Markup by
07/18/1991 Reported by
Senate Rules and Administration08/02/1991 Referred to
10/03/1991 Markup by
10/03/1991 Reported by

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.172.

Subjects (4)

  • Congressional publications
  • House of Representatives
  • Political science

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.172. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/1991)

Provides for the printing of a revised edition of the booklet entitled "Our American Government" as a House document. Requires additional printing of such document for the use of the House of Representatives, the Senate, and the Joint Committee on Printing.