Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/30/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/30/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/30/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/30/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/30/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/30/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/30/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/02/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/02/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/02/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/02/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/02/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/16/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/16/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/16/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 09/16/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/16/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/16/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/16/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/16/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/16/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/16/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/16/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/16/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/16/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/02/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/02/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/02/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/02/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/02/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/02/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/02/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/02/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/02/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/02/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 10/02/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 10/03/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 10/03/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 10/03/1991
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 10/03/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/09/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/09/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/09/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/09/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/09/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/09/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/09/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/09/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/09/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/16/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/16/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/16/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/16/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/30/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/30/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/30/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/30/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/30/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/01/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/01/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/01/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/07/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 11/07/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 11/07/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 11/14/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 11/18/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/18/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/18/1991