Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/17/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/17/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/17/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/17/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/17/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/17/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/17/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/17/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 10/09/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/09/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/09/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 10/09/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/09/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/09/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/09/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/09/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/22/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 11/22/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/05/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/05/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/14/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/14/1992