Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 11/07/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 11/19/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/19/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/19/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 11/19/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 11/19/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 11/19/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/19/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/19/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/19/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/19/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 11/19/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 11/19/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/19/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 11/19/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 11/19/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 11/19/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 11/19/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/20/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 11/20/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/20/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/20/1991
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 11/20/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 11/21/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/21/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/21/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/21/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/21/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 11/21/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 11/22/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 11/22/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/22/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/22/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 11/22/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 11/26/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/26/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 11/26/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 11/26/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 11/26/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 11/26/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/26/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/26/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/04/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/04/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1992