Committees: H.Con.Res.246 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/21/1991 Referred to
06/18/1992 Markup by
06/30/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-635 Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness01/15/1992 Referred to
05/12/1992 Markup by
05/12/1992 Reported by
House Ways and Means11/21/1991 Referred to
07/29/1992 Markup by
07/31/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-635 Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade11/25/1991 Referred to
07/23/1992 Markup by
07/23/1992 Reported by
Senate Finance08/07/1992 Referred to