Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 01/30/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/30/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/30/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/30/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/30/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/30/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 01/30/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/30/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/30/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/30/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/24/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 02/24/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/24/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/24/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/24/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/24/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/24/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/24/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/24/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/24/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/24/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/27/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/27/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/27/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/27/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/11/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/11/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/11/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/11/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/11/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/11/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/11/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/11/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/11/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/11/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/12/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 03/17/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/25/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/25/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/25/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/29/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/09/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/09/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/09/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/09/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/09/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/09/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/18/1992