Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/19/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/19/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 03/19/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/19/1992
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/05/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/05/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/05/1992
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/05/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/05/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/05/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/05/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/05/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/05/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/05/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/05/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/05/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/05/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/05/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/05/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/05/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/05/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/05/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/05/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/21/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/28/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/28/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 07/28/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/28/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/28/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/28/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/28/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/28/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/28/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/28/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/28/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/28/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/28/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/28/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/28/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/28/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/09/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/09/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 09/09/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/09/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/09/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/09/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/09/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/09/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/09/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/09/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/09/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/09/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/09/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/09/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/09/1992
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 10/05/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 10/05/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/05/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/05/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/05/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/05/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/05/1992