There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that the President should extend for a period of one year the 90-day moratorium on new unnecessary federal regulations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/08/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/15/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
04/08/1992Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/08/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 04/08/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 04/08/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/08/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/09/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 06/17/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/17/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/24/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/02/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Operations04/08/1992 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security04/15/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.307.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/08/1992)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the President should extend for one year the 90-day moratorium on new unnecessary Federal regulations ordered in the President's Memorandum on Reducing the Burden of Government Regulations, dated January 28, 1992.