There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that the United States should not recognize the government of the former Yugoslavian Republic under the name Macedonia.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/29/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/12/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/29/1992Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/09/1992
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/16/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/24/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/29/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East05/12/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.313.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.313. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/29/1992)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the United States should not recognize the Government of the former Yugoslavian Republic of Skopje until that Government adopts constitutional and political guarantees ensuring that it has no territorial claims toward Greece and refrains from the use of the name Republic of Macedonia.