Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/29/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/06/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 02/06/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/06/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 02/06/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/06/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/06/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/06/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/06/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/06/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/06/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/06/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/06/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 02/06/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/06/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 02/06/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/06/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/06/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/27/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/27/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/27/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/27/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/27/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 02/27/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/27/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/27/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 02/27/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/27/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/27/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/27/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/27/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/27/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/07/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/07/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 03/07/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/13/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 03/13/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/13/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/13/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/13/1991