Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 03/05/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 03/06/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/06/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 03/06/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 03/06/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/06/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/06/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/06/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/06/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/06/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 03/06/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/06/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/06/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/06/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 03/06/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/06/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/06/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/06/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/06/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 03/06/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/06/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/06/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/06/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/06/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/06/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/06/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 03/06/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/06/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 03/06/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 03/06/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/06/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/06/1991
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/06/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/06/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/06/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/06/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/06/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 03/06/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 03/06/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/06/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/06/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 03/06/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/06/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/06/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 03/06/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/06/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 03/06/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/06/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/06/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/06/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/06/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/07/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 05/14/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/20/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/20/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/20/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/20/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/20/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/20/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/20/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/20/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/20/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/20/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/20/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/20/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/20/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/20/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/20/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/20/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/20/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/20/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/20/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 05/20/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/20/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/20/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/20/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/20/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/20/1991